ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1080185

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert James Ingham Clark Trustee 01 September 2017
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
Timothy William Jones Trustee 01 November 2019
THE NATIONAL BOTANIC GARDEN OF WALES Received: On time
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
SUSAN DINGWALL Trustee 01 May 2012
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
MAGED ABURAMADAN Trustee 08 May 2013 None on record
John Macaskill Trustee 08 January 2018
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
NICOLETTE SHAW Trustee 13 September 2012
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
David Verity Trustee 24 June 2016
BRITISH OCULOPLASTIC SURGERY SOCIETY Received: On time
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF OPHTHALMIC PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY (ESOPRS) Recently registered
NICHOLAS GOULDING Trustee 13 September 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WINCHESTER ST LAWRENCE WITH ST SWITHUN-UPON-KINGSGATE Received: On time
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
THE HM TOWER OF LONDON CHAPELS ROYAL FOUNDATION
GUY MORTON Trustee 12 September 2011
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
HOUGHTON & WYTON COMMUNITY FUND Received: On time
MR Herbert von Bose Trustee 25 June 2014
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
David Pyott Trustee 01 October 2020
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
Diane Corner Trustee 10 May 2021
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP
Andrew John Cash Trustee 06 September 2018
ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM EYE HOSPITAL GROUP