Financial history RURAL ARTS NORTH YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1081007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £369.02k £311.42k £353.07k £627.53k £526.37k
Total expenditure £401.53k £357.67k £282.70k £390.85k £394.05k
Income from government contracts £20.96k £13.39k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.60k £13.39k £272.89k £539.15k £343.73k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £10.84k £23.79k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £19.49k £85.18k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £539.15k £343.73k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £58.05k £73.67k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £378.94k £382.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £11.91k £11.86k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0