Financial history THE LOWE SYNDROME TRUST

Charity number: 1081241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £77.94k £64.83k £67.37k £43.15k £57.58k
Total expenditure £98.65k £41.16k £75.54k £75.56k £56.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A