THE CHILDREN OF LOTA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1081372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £19.10k £31.10k £25.90k £34.64k £24.80k
Total expenditure £24.32k £28.22k £27.69k £29.92k £25.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A