TURKISH CYPRIOT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1080926
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.28m £1.32m £1.33m £1.28m £1.22m
Total expenditure £1.27m £1.28m £1.32m £1.32m £1.24m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £20.80k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £35.14k £0 £1.48k £63.69k £80.99k
Income - Other trading activities £33.09k £46.07k £0 £0 £484
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.26m £1.27m £1.16m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £61 £163 £0 £0 £47.36k
Income - Other £1.22m £18.78k £50.03k £49.41k £1.10m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £35.14k £1.28m £3.73k £469 £3.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £2.19k £57.99k £13.44k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.23m £0 £1.32m £1.27m £1.23m