CREECH ST MICHAEL PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1080889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 January 2020 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required