CREECH ST MICHAEL PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1080889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £14.38k £8.70k £8.70k £10.13k £4.68k
Total expenditure £7.67k £4.37k £4.37k £8.16k £9.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A