FRIENDS OF ST OSWALDS, GRASMERE

Charity number: 1081080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £10.93k £12.28k £9.23k £79.81k £10.59k
Total expenditure £0 £25.00k £9.81k £10.00k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A