BLACKPOOL POLAR BEARS

Charity number: 1082638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £53.77k £41.85k £36.69k £36.37k £11.15k
Total expenditure £39.38k £74.64k £40.17k £32.27k £10.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k £0 N/A £4.00k N/A