ST. MARY'S CONVENT AND NURSING HOME (CHISWICK)

Charity number: 1080751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Marshall Trustee 17 February 2020 None on record
SISTER MARY CLARE Trustee 16 April 2015
SAINT MARGARET'S CONVENT (SSM CHISWICK) CIO Recently registered
JOHN BARRIE RANDLE Trustee 24 March 2000 None on record
Alan Martin Trustee 16 February 2021 None on record
SISTER JENNIFER ANNE SSM Chair 24 March 2000 None on record
SISTER MARY PAUL SSM Trustee 06 November 2013 None on record
SISTER CYNTHIA CLARE SSM Trustee 03 November 2015 None on record