Trustees THE MASHAM CHURCH (2000)
Charity number: 1084082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT EDWARD JAMESON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen North | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Bromhead | Trustee | 28 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Arnold | Trustee | 28 June 2020 |
|
|||||
JAMES HUNTER | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MARK FIELDHOUSE | Trustee | 07 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIAS MOUBAYED | Trustee | 03 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Waddington | Trustee | 20 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUSAN CUNLIFFE-LISTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
janet Jameson | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.