Accounts and annual returns BRIDGWATER OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1089254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 08 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 10 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 10 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window