SECOND CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, LONDON

Charity number: 1084322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £242.94k £276.35k £269.50k £274.84k £262.95k
Total expenditure £150.80k £188.58k £181.22k £178.47k £108.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A