ST MICHAEL'S RESTORATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1092416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.03k £2.76k £834 £1.27k £1.56k
Total expenditure £45.00k £4.32k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A