THE HIGHCREST ACADEMY FUND

Charity number: 1083283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 19 March 2021 323 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 August 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 June 2018 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required