ST GILES EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1081739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £548.59k £563.87k £625.29k £656.11k £159.52k
Total expenditure £622.80k £594.58k £612.85k £627.36k £412.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £345.88k £387.52k £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £542.46k £215.95k £234.60k £654.31k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £6.14k £2.04k £3.17k £1.81k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £622.80k £594.58k £612.85k £627.36k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.00k £2.00k £2.00k £2.01k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £17.15k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A