Accounts and annual returns THE PIKELOCK TRUST

Charity number: 1082865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 12 December 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 23 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 08 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required