DEER INITIATIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1082289
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time