WORLD ANIMAL PROTECTION

Charity number: 1081849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Franc Cortada Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record
Berangere Andree Mireille Michel Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record
Svetlana Ignatieva Trustee 02 June 2020 None on record
Karen Winton Trustee 01 June 2017 None on record
Dr Frank Barrientos Alarcon Trustee 02 June 2020 None on record
Jamie Craig Trustee 02 June 2020 None on record
Joanna Kerr Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
Sarah Ireland Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
CHRISTINE LLOYD Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
Sandra Lynn Bereti Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record
Mwikali Nzioka Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record