Financial history CATALYST STOCKTON ON TEES LIMITED

Charity number: 1083231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.06m £994.79k £1.17m £523.76k £561.22k
Total expenditure £1.17m £1.31m £1.25m £719.83k £549.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £353.17k £217.40k
Income from government grants £89.25k £89.25k £89.25k £99.75k £97.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £93.82k £94.60k £98.50k £97.75k £181.07k
Income - Other trading activities £46.44k £39.01k £32.12k £34.21k £26.21k
Income - Charitable activities £912.54k £842.33k £1.04m £387.99k £351.75k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.47k £18.85k £3.29k £3.81k £2.19k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.27m £1.21m £686.49k £539.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £44.97k £40.85k £39.20k £33.34k £9.39k
Expenditure - Governance £42.93k £0 £42.50k £0 £37.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0