TALYLLYN HOLDINGS LIMITED

Charity number: 1089053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £121.00k £1.19m £1.70m £1.67m £1.30m
Total expenditure £187.67k £1.15m £1.31m £1.40m £1.03m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £360.42k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £228.87k £233.37k £509.58k £790.82k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £477.60k £536.61k £531.30k £249.60k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £466.28k £550.85k £604.66k £251.18k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £2.29k £3.24k £2.23k £547
Income - Other N/A £11.60k £375.36k £18.04k £7.25k
Income - Legacies N/A £45.50k £59.44k £92.93k £82.93k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £755.20k £859.74k £928.63k £798.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £391.77k £449.08k £466.67k £230.52k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £13.00k £13.00k £13.03k £12.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0