Financial history THE LITTLE BIRCH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1083986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £62.80k £78.18k £70.92k £86.51k £84.38k
Total expenditure £48.66k £80.07k £84.14k £81.63k £86.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £67.85k £61.18k £76.22k £72.38k