AGE CONCERN UPWELL AND OUTWELL LUNCHEON CLUB

Charity number: 1082825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.82k £5.59k £4.39k £8.54k £3.30k
Total expenditure £5.79k £5.77k £5.84k £6.39k £4.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A