Trustees THE CHILTERN UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1082794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Myfanwy Jones | Chair | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lee Christopher Elton | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Elsie Routly | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christian Nicholas Scott | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anne Walton | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wallace Pollock Wormley | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Jobson | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Arthur Hender | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ernest Newhouse | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Susan Harold-Barry | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
HELEN JEAN BEAUMONT | Trustee | 19 May 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.