Accounts and annual returns BOURNEMOUTH NORTHBOURNE A TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1082523
Charity reporting is overdue by 1761 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 300 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 300 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 665 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 665 days
Annual return 31 January 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1031 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1031 days
Annual return 31 January 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1396 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1396 days
Annual return 31 January 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1761 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1761 days