THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1082733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £27.55k £30.21k £28.12k £30.55k £13.78k
Total expenditure £31.50k £25.24k £10.15k £8.42k £2.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A