TRINITY HELPERS

Charity number: 1090112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2019 21 January 2021 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2016 20 June 2017 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2016 Not Required