BONGO PORIBAR

Charity number: 1084896
Charity reporting is overdue by 1697 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 236 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 236 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 602 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 602 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 967 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 967 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1332 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1332 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1697 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1697 days