BEDDINGTON EVENING TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1083127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 18 September 2020 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 01 March 2019 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 19 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required