Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST. GABRIEL'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1088708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 October 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 September 2019 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required