Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST. GABRIEL'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1088708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.21k £5.17k £5.62k £4.32k £1.72k
Total expenditure £2.07k £6.99k £3.30k £3.06k £10.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A