Dogfen lywodraethu THE GUISBOROUGH BRIDGE ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED 9 APRIL 2001, 09 NOVEMBER 2009 AND 18 OCTOBER 2010. as amended on 21 Jun 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GUISBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT),WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR RELIGION OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AGENCIES OF THE GOVERNMENT AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT THE ADVANCE OF EDUCATION, SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AVAILABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. TO OPERATE IN ALIGNMENT WITH THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHURCHES TOGETHER IN GUISBOROUGH TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY.
Maes buddion
REDCAR + CLEVELAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.