Financial history ST CLEMENT DANES SCHOOL ANCHOR FUND

Charity number: 1084865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £64.07k £64.10k £66.52k £58.89k £44.09k
Total expenditure £44.32k £81.56k £43.55k £107.32k £54.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A