YORK RACIAL EQUALITY NETWORK

Charity number: 1084619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Grace Helliwell Trustee 02 April 2018
YORK RACIAL EQUALITY NETWORK Recently registered
MAHENDRA VERMA Trustee
YORK RACIAL EQUALITY NETWORK Recently registered
LISA MAYER Trustee 30 November 2013
SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF YORK Received: On time
YORK RACIAL EQUALITY NETWORK Recently registered
DARYOUSH MAZLOUM Trustee 02 December 2018
YORK RACIAL EQUALITY NETWORK Recently registered
TANG HALL BIG LOCAL Received: On time
FREDERICK RING Trustee
YORK RACIAL EQUALITY NETWORK Recently registered
Panagiotis Boumpoulis Trustee 23 February 2021 None on record
Dr Ramalakshmi Isaiah Chair 23 August 2021 None on record