Trustees STAUNTON AND CORSE EARLY YEARS
Charity number: 1084232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Megan Bourne | Chair | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Brian Tibbles | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katy Welsh | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Francesca White | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Palmer | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Phelps | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.