NORFOLK COALITION OF DISABLED PEOPLE

Charity number: 1084108

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Symons Trustee 14 February 2019 None on record
Fraser Bowe Trustee 11 December 2017 None on record
Duncan Scott Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
Jen Hayden Trustee 17 December 2019 None on record
SHAUN MCGARRY Trustee 13 March 2014
GREAT YARMOUTH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION Received: On time