AFRICAN HEALTH CARE FOR LIFE

Charity number: 1091122
Charity reporting is overdue by 233 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 August 2019 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 March 2018 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 March 2018 411 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required