Dogfen lywodraethu RETRAINING OF RACE HORSES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND REHABILITATION OF RACEHORSES AND FORMER RACEHORSES WHICH ARE UNWANTED OR VULNERABLE TO ABANDONMENT, ABUSE, MISUSE OR NEGLECT, OR OTHERWISE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY MEANS OF RETRAINING AND REHOUSING.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.