Accounts and annual returns LONDON NORTH WEST HEALTHCARE CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1083634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window