BRIDGWATER AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1084262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.45k £6.24k £5.30k £2.46k £4.68k
Total expenditure £4.44k £6.40k £4.10k £5.48k £5.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A