Accounts and annual returns THE WILTON AND DISTRICT LINK SCHEME

Charity number: 1084953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required