Trustees 3RD NEWBURY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1091193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAN ANDREA LARGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alison Jane Cutts | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah May Corsham | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael O'Donnell | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James Austin March | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Barr | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Bailey | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Barr | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
TOM ALEXANDER SEWARD | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA BATEHUP | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.