ZICHRON YECHESKEL TRUST (ZYT)

Charity number: 1084429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £255.49k £232.85k £297.84k £177.30k £307.71k
Total expenditure £274.36k £246.98k £290.29k £342.15k £268.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A