Financial history ST ATHANASIUS COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 1086561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £86.39k £104.11k £273.80k £141.67k £202.42k
Total expenditure £50.39k £133.45k £105.80k £32.91k £38.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £19.12k