Financial history THE CHELMER CANAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1086112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.55k £1.33k £1.38k £1.52k £3.49k
Total expenditure £1.99k £1.57k £1.19k £1.72k £2.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A