AL-ANSAR ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1086387
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £79.40k £98.27k £123.60k £275.92k £169.42k
Total expenditure £77.60k £74.92k £99.99k £157.08k £103.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A