Trustees MOTOCROSS CHALLENGE PROJECT
Charity number: 1086714
Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jon Rodger | Chair | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Newton | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen North | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Ovenden | Trustee | 28 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Rodger | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Castle | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.