Accounts and annual returns HALIFAX OPPORTUNITIES TRUST

Charity number: 1086183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 February 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window