NEW BEGINNINGS-HOMES FOR STREET CHILDREN OF THE WORLD

Charity number: 1087263
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 05 March 2021 5 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 01 March 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 25 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 02 March 2019 2 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 30 March 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required