NEW BEGINNINGS-HOMES FOR STREET CHILDREN OF THE WORLD

Charity number: 1087263
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £11.23k £11.55k £119.33k £11.62k £28.07k
Total expenditure £13.71k £9.13k £28.31k £14.03k £37.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A